EP0796815 - Hoisting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 P.O. Box 11 2003 Neuchâtel-Serrières / CH | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cestonaro, Jean Ruelle Jeanhenry 1 2074 Marin / CH | 02 /
Mathon, Jean-Luc chemin de la Croisée 8 2072 Marin / CH | 03 /
Christen, Pascal chemin des Landions 6 2016 Cortaillod / CH | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810170.9 | 18.03.1996 | [1997/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796815 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/02 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
B66F7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/50] |
Former [1997/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung | [1997/39] | English: | Hoisting device | [1997/39] | French: | Dispositif de levage | [1997/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/04] | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.1997 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1997 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1036492 (CAPGRAS) [Y] 1-3,6-9,13 * page 4, paragraph 6; figure 5 *; | [Y]FR2397348 (KEMPF & CO AG) [Y] 1-3,6-9,13 * page 7, lines 25-37; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0290796 (FOCKE & CO) [X] 1,12 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE2354064 (HOFMANN MASCHF GEB) [A] 4 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR750503 (JOLY) [A] 2 * page 1, lines 52-56; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH05162989 (DAIFUKU CO LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH03166132 (YUNITSUTA KK) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 * |