EP0736365 - Multilayered hollow plastic article and method for obtaining same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems Ltd. 500 Queen Street South Bolton, ON L7E 5S5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD. 500 Queen Street South Bolton Ontario L7E 5S5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valyi, Emery I. 102 Moseman Avenue Katonah, NY 10536 / US | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [1996/41] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810202.0 | 01.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | US19950415350 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: US 415350 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736365 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736365 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736365 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B65D23/02, B29C49/22, B29K67/00, B29K667/00 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
B65D23/02 (EP,US);
B29C45/14 (EP,US);
B29C49/02 (EP,US);
B65D1/0215 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3026 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C51/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1379 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiger Kunststoffgegenstand und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/41] | English: | Multilayered hollow plastic article and method for obtaining same | [1996/41] | French: | Objet creux multicouches en matière plastique et procédé d'obtention | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.07.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | AT | 01.04.2003 | GB | 01.04.2003 | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/22] | NL | 17.07.2002 | |
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
GB | 01.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 17.07.2002 | |
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 17.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2262908 (VALYI EMERY I) [A] 1,5,9 * figure - *; | [DA]US3954923 (VALYI EMERY I) [DA] 9 * figure - *; | [A]WO8401352 (NAT CAN CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [XA]EP0533437 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 20 * * column 31, line 48 - line 53 * [A] 9; | [A]WO9507220 (PLASTIPAK PACKAGING INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9* figure - * |