EP0765600 - Installation for the dosed delivery of feed to a plurality of delivery points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vogl, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Güttlfeld 153 A-4070 Eferding / AT | [1997/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 96890133.0 | 12.08.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | AT19950001600 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: AT 160095 | AT19960000018U | 17.01.1996 Original published format: AT 1896 U | [1997/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765600 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/02 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
A01K5/0216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/14] | Title | German: | Anlage zur dosierten Abgabe von Futter an mehrere Abgabestellen | [1997/14] | English: | Installation for the dosed delivery of feed to a plurality of delivery points | [1997/14] | French: | Installation pour le dosage et la distribution d'un mélange alimentaire dans des récipients différents | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/47] | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0126240 (LOHMANN APPARATEBAU GMBH) [X] 1,5 * page 13; figure 1 *; | [X]AT384147B (LEO BÖHM GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0373147 (VOGL) [AD] 3,4 * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0595784 (VOGL) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |