EP0806024 - PLAYING DEVICE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eiba, Peter Hunnenstrasse 3 D-86343 Königsbrunn / DE | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [1997/46] | Fiener, Josef Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96902252.4 | 25.01.1996 | [1997/46] | WO1996EP00306 | Priority number, date | DE1995102613 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19502613 | [1997/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623289 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806024 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0806024 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
G07F17/3248 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,KR,US);
G07F17/3218 (EP,US);
G07F17/3251 (EP,US);
G07F17/3276 (EP,US);
G07F17/3281 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | SPIELGERÄTESYSTEM | [1997/46] | English: | PLAYING DEVICE SYSTEM | [1997/46] | French: | SYSTEME D'APPAREILS DE JEU | [1997/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Request for further processing for: | 31.08.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 31.08.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.09.1999 | GR | 15.09.1999 | NL | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | DK | 15.12.1999 | PT | 15.12.1999 | AT | 25.01.2000 | LU | 25.01.2000 | BE | 31.01.2000 | CH | 31.01.2000 | LI | 31.01.2000 | MC | 31.01.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
GR | 15.09.1999 | ||
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
DK | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
DK | 15.12.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
NL | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
MC | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 15.09.1999 | |
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | PT | 15.12.1999 | |
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | IE | 15.09.1999 | |
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
AT | 25.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | IE | 15.09.1999 | |
PT | 15.12.1999 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | PT | 15.12.1999 | |
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/26] | PT | 15.12.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4494197 (TROY SEYMOUR [US], et al) [A] 1* column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US4669730 (SMALL MAYNARD E [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 7 *; | [YA]WO8902139 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 4,5,9 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 29; figure - * [A] 1,13,14; | [XY]EP0450520 (GANOT ZVI [IL]) [X] 1-3,8,11-13 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 34; figure -; claim 8 * [Y] 4,5,9,10; | [Y]DE4136065 (GRUNDIG EMV) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 23 - line 30; figure - *; | [A]US5326104 (PEASE LOGAN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [XAY]US5340119 (GOLDFARB SIMON [US]) [X] 1,11,14 * column 1, line 20 - line 56; figure - * [A] 4,5 [Y] 9,10; | [XY]EP0620688 (NEWS DATACOM LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7,12,13 * column 7, line 42 - column 10, line 1; figures 1,2 * * column 12, line 15 - line 43; figure 5 * [Y] 4,5,9,10 |