|
01.06.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2004 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.10.2004 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
21 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
23.04.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2004 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
94 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.04.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.08.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.08.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
15.08.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |