EP0816501 - DNA ENCODING PROTEIN KINASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEZU, Junichi Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi Shizuoka-ken 412 / JP | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96906032.6 | 15.03.1996 | [1998/02] | WO1996JP00660 | Priority number, date | JP19950057104 | 16.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5710495 | [1998/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9628554 | Date: | 19.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816501 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816501 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N9/10 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/02] | Title | German: | FÜR EINE PROTEIN-KINASE KODIERENDE DNA | [2005/10] | English: | DNA ENCODING PROTEIN KINASE | [1998/02] | French: | CODAGE DE LA PROTEINE KINASE PAR L'ADN | [1998/02] |
Former [1998/02] | FÜR EINE PROTEIN-KIMASE KODIERENDE DNA | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1997 | Translation filed | 16.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | ES | 12.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
ES | 12.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - DIETRICH, F.S. ET AL., "SERINE/THREONINE-PROTEIN KINASE PAK1", SWISSPROT, (19950201), XP002130258 [X] 1,3,4,7 * the whole document * | [PX] - SU, JIN-YUAN ET AL, "Cloning and characterization of a novel serine /threonine protein kinase expressed in early Xenopus embryos", J. BIOL. CHEM. (1996), 271(24), 14430-14437, XP000872873 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.24.14430 | [A] - HANKS S K ET AL, "THE PROTEIN KINASE FAMILY: CONSERVED FEATURES AND DEDUCED PHYLOGENYOF THE CATALYTIC DOMAINS", SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, (19880701), vol. 241, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 42 - 52, XP002014781 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3291115 | International search | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., Vol. 84, (1987), STEVEN K. HANDS et al., "Homology Probing: Identification of cDNA Clones Encoding Members of the Protein-Serine Kinase Family", pages 388-392. | [Y] - ONCOGENE, Vol. 9, No. 12, (1994), LARSSON CATHARINA et al., "BMX, A Novel Nonreceptor Tyrosine Kinase Gene of the BTK:ITK:TEC:TXK Family Located in Chromosome Xp22.2", pages 3683-3688. | [Y] - J. BIOL. CHEM., Vol. 269, No. 14, (1994), MARK MELANIE R. et al., "rse, A Novel Receptor-Type Tyrosine Kinase with Homology to Ax1/Ufo, is Expressed at High Levels in the Brain", pages 10720-10728. | [Y] - ONCOGENE, Vol. 9, No. 3, (1993), OHASHI KAZUMA et al., "Cloning of the cDNA for a Novel Receptor Tyrosine Kinase, Sky, Predominantly Expressed in Brain", pages 699-705. | [Y] - ONCOGENE, Vol. 8, No. 12, (1993), KARN THOMAS et al., "Structure, Expression and Chromosomal Mapping of TKT from Man and Mouse: A New Subclass of Receptor Tyrosine Kinase with a Factor VIII-Like Domain", pages 3433-3440. | [Y] - SCIENCE, Vol. 241, (1988), STEVEN K. HANKS et al., "The Protein Kinase Family: Conserved Features and Deduced Phylogeny of the Catalitic Domains", pages 42-52. |