EP0818064 - LOCKING COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULTRA ELECTRONICS LIMITED Bridport Road Greenford Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states ULTRA ELECTRONICS LIMITED Bridport Road Greenford, Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCKLEY, Paul, Philip 72 Dilmore Avenue Fernhill Heath, Worcestershire WR3 7XA / GB | 02 /
HALL, Rex Hilltop, 86 Holloway Pershore, Worcestershire WR10 1HP / GB | 03 /
COLLIER, Malcolm, Wilfrid 39 Wynyards Close Tewkesbury, Gloucestershire GL20 5QZ / GB | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Beck, Simon Antony Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyers Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96908256.9 | 01.04.1996 | [1998/03] | WO1996GB00779 | Priority number, date | GB19950006700 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9506700 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9630970 | Date: | 03.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818064 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818064 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/622 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
H01R13/622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/03] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSKUPPLUNG | [1998/03] | English: | LOCKING COUPLING | [1998/03] | French: | COUPLAGE A VERROUILLAGE | [1998/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2829358 (GIGLIO TESTORI) [A] 1-7* column 3, line 8 - line 73; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2840728 (SPINNER GEORG DIPL-ING DR-ING) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2563949 (DEUTSCH CO [FR]) [Y] 8 * page 3, line 1 - line 15; figures 1,7 *; | [XY]US4648671 (TORBAN YEFIM [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 29 - line 51 * * column 2, line 24 - line 34; figures 1,4A * [Y] 8 |