|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
30.04.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.04.2008 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
17 |
|
08.01.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.08.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
76 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
15 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
23 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
51 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
52 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
160 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
61 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
62 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
64 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1998 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
31.10.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |