EP0828855 - Oligonucleotide sizing using cleavable primers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/12] | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE SIZING USING CLEAVABLE PRIMERS | ||
[1998/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park California 94025-3493 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states SRI INTERNATIONAL 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025-3493 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONFORTE, Joseph, Albert 50 Alamo Avenue Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | 02 /
BECKER, Christopher, Hank 106 Clover Lane Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
SHALER, Thomas, Andrew 1384 4th Avenue 3 San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 04 /
POLLART, Daniel, Joseph 855 Arbor Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96913305.7 | 30.04.1996 | [1998/12] | WO1996US06116 | Priority number, date | US19950445751 | 22.05.1995 Original published format: US 445751 | US19960639363 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 639363 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9637630 | Date: | 28.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0828855 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828855 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, H01J49/26, C07H21/00 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/68 (KR);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6872 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2563/167, C12Q2521/301 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2563/167, C12Q2525/131 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2565/627, C12Q2523/319 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2565/627, C12Q2525/131 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2563/167, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2525/131 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6872, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2523/319 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6872, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2525/131 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6872, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2563/167, C12Q2521/301 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/12] | Title | German: | Bestimmung der Oligonucleotid-Länge unter Verwendung von spaltbaren Primern | [1998/48] | English: | Oligonucleotide sizing using cleavable primers | [1998/48] | French: | Détermination de la taille d'oligonucléotides à l'aide d'amorces d'amplification pouvant être scindées | [1998/48] |
Former [1998/12] | OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN-LÄNGTE-BESTIMMUNG DURCH MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE UND BENUTZUNG VON SPALTBAREN PRIMERN | ||
Former [1998/12] | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE SIZING USING CLEAVABLE PRIMERS | ||
Former [1998/12] | DETERMINATION DE LA TAILLE D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES A L'AIDE D'AMORCES SCINDABLES | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9416101 (KOESTER HUBERT [US]) [Y] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9205287 (AMGEN INC [US]) [Y] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0360676 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]WO8912694 (GENOMYX INC [US]) | [Y] - WU ET AL., "Time-of-flight mass spectrometry of underivatized single-stranded DNA oligomers by matrix-assisted laser desorption.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, COLUMBUS US, (1994), vol. 66, pages 1637 - 1645, XP000579973 [Y] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00082a007 | [DY] - W. SZYBALSKI, "Universal restriction endonucleases: designing novel cleavage specificities by combining adapter olideoxinucleotide and enzyme moieties", GENE, AMSTERDAM NL, (1985), vol. 40, pages 169 - 173, XP002012188 [DY] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(85)90039-3 | [Y] - M: FROHMAN, Cloning PCR products, BOSTON, US, BIRKHÄUSER, (1994), XP002012189 [Y] 1-39 * page 14 - page 37 * |