EP0777642 - SOLID CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aristech Chemical Corporation 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2704 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states ARISTECH CHEMICAL CORPORATION 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2704 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUGACH, Joseph Apartment 1035 1000 Eagles Nest Lane Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 02 /
SMEAL, Thomas, W. 12 Buena Vista Drive Delmont, PA 15626 / US | 03 /
KARP, Howard, S. 151 Kelvington Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96914790.9 | 28.05.1996 | [1997/24] | WO1996US07926 | Priority number, date | US19950488561 | 09.06.1995 Original published format: US 488561 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9641792 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/56] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0777642 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/00, C07C67/08, C07C69/80 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/24] | C07C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | FESTER KATALYSATOR | [1997/24] | English: | SOLID CATALYST | [1997/24] | French: | CATALYSEUR SOLIDE | [1997/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1997 | Search fee paid | 30.01.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/23] | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2710630 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [X] 1-9 * page 1 - page 4; claim - * * page 8, paragraph 5 - page 9, paragraph 5 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 22 - page 24; example . * * page 32 - page 33 * | International search | [A]US5401486 (MUELLER ULRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US5183930 (VENTER JEREMIA J [US], et al); | [A]US4032550 (WHITE JOHN F, et al); | [A]US3056817 (WERBER FRANK X, et al); | [A]US2928853 (BOND JR GEORGE R) |