|
31.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.11.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
86 |
|
25.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.10.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
10.05.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
12.12.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |