|
25.06.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
14.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.01.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.12.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.05.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.08.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
19.12.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |