EP0781431 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING HISTORY OF FILE ACCESS TO SUPPORT AUTOMATIC FILE CACHING ON PORTABLE AND DESKTOP COMPUTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIRRUS LOGIC, INC. 3100 West Warren Avenue Fremont, CA 94538-6423 / US | [1997/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISHOP, Peter, B. 705 West Washington Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Lundquist, Arne Oxoen 1:9 139 50 Vaermdoe / SE | [1998/05] |
Former [1997/27] | Lundquist, Arne Pionjärgatan 31 587 34 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 96924549.7 | 16.07.1996 | [1997/27] | WO1996US11801 | Priority number, date | US19950001455P | 17.07.1995 Original published format: US 1455 P | US19960639016 | 24.04.1996 Original published format: US 639016 | [1998/17] |
Former [1997/27] | US19950600145 | 17.07.1995 | |
US19960639016 | 24.04.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9704393 | Date: | 06.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781431 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/12 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
G06F12/121 (EP,US);
G06F2212/401 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99955 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL [1997/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG DER GESCHICHTE VON DATEIZUGRIFFEN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER AUTOMATISCHEN DATEICACHESPEICHERUNG AUF TRAGBAREN UND NICHT-TRAGBAREN RECHNERN | [1997/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING HISTORY OF FILE ACCESS TO SUPPORT AUTOMATIC FILE CACHING ON PORTABLE AND DESKTOP COMPUTERS | [1997/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR CODER L'HISTORIQUE DE L'ACCES AUX FICHIERS POUR SUPPORTER LA MISE EN ANTEMEMOIRE AUTOMATIQUE DE FICHIERS SUR DES ORDINATEURS DE BUREAU OU PORTABLES | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 20.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0567420 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,13,14,26 * column 6, line 21 - line 53; figure 3 *; | [A] - KISTLER J J ET AL, "DISCONNECTED OPERATION IN THE CODA FILE SYSTEM", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW (SIGOPS), (19910101), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 213 - 225, XP000288313 [A] 1,13,14,26 * page 218, paragraph 4.3.1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/121133.121166 | [A] - WILLICK D L ET AL, "DISK CACHE REPLACEMENT POLICIES FOR NETWORK FILESERVERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTIN SYSTEMS, PITTSBURGH, MAY 25 - 28, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930525), no. CONF. 13, pages 2 - 11, XP000399367 [A] 1,13,14,26 * page 3, column R, line 45 - page 4, column R, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.1993.287729 |