|
09.11.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.10.2010 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Lawyer) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.09.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.07.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.06.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.04.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.1998 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1998 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1998 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |