|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2008 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
61 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Request for change of address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2006 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
54 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
21 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
48 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
24 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
119 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.02.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
27.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
45 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Description |
Appeal |
11 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.07.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
12.02.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2003 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Letter Legal Board, without references of sender |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2002 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2000 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2000 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.02.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |