EP0848694 - REDUCING ESTROGENICITY OF ALKOXYLATED COMPOUNDS AND PRODUCTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WITCO CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states WITCO CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich, Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEADOWS, M., Wayne 803 South Texas Deridder, Louisiana 70634 / US | 02 /
BERGER, Christie 3014 Deer Creek Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | 03 /
BERGER, Paul 3014 Deer Creek Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | 04 /
CRAVEY, Rodney 10802 Leslie Manvel, TX 77578 / US | 05 /
DAVIS, Charles 3771 Sn Lucas Drive Houston, TX 77083 / US | 06 /
FRILOUX, Kim 926 Tanglewild Lane Richmond, TX 77469 / US | 07 /
GREEN, Charles 3402 Hampshire Pearland, TX 77581 / US | 08 /
DAU-LU, Ying 10102 Sagegate Houston, TX 77089 / US | 09 /
NGUYEN, Giao 4807 Five Knoll Drive Friendship, TX 77546 / US | [1998/35] |
Former [1998/26] | 01 /
MEADOWS, M., Wayne 511 Land Grant Richmond Richmond, TX 77469 / US | ||
02 /
BERGER, Christie 3014 Deer Creek Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | |||
03 /
BERGER, Paul 3014 Deer Creek Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | |||
04 /
CRAVEY, Rodney 10802 Leslie Manvel, TX 77578 / US | |||
05 /
DAVIS, Charles 6771 Westchase Houston, TX 77072 / US | |||
06 /
FRILOUX, Kim 926 Tanglewild Lane Richmond, TX 77469 / US | |||
07 /
GREEN, Charles 3402 Hampshire Pearland, TX 77581 / US | |||
08 /
DAU-LU, Ying 10102 Sagegate Houston, TX 77089 / US | |||
09 /
NGUYEN, Giao 4807 Five Knoll Drive Friendship, TX 77546 / US | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96930493.0 | 02.08.1996 | [1998/26] | WO1996US12673 | Priority number, date | US19950511130 | 04.08.1995 Original published format: US 511130 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706125 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848694 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/184, C07C43/20, C07C43/04, C07C43/06, C07C43/115, C07C43/23 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
C08G65/329 (EP);
C07C43/184 (KR);
C07C43/04 (KR);
C07C43/06 (KR);
C07C43/20 (KR);
C07C43/23 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/26] | C07C43/184, C07C43/20, C07C43/04, C07C43/06, C07C43/115 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/26] | Title | German: | VERMINDERUNG DER ESTROGENIZITÄT VON ALKOXYLIERTEN VERBINDUNGEN UND IHREN PRODUKTEN | [1998/32] | English: | REDUCING ESTROGENICITY OF ALKOXYLATED COMPOUNDS AND PRODUCTS THEREOF | [1998/26] | French: | REDUCTION DE L'ESTROGENICITE DE COMPOSES ALCOXYLES ET DE LEURS PRODUITS | [1998/26] |
Former [1998/26] | VERMINDERUNG DER ESTROGENIZITÄT ALKOXYLIERTER VREBINDUNGEN UND DER PRODUKTE DARAUS | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 06.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2903486 (G.L. BROWN) [X] 1,2,6,7 * example - *; | [X]US3223643 (LAW ANDREW B) [X] 1,2 * claim 1; table I *; | [X]WO8200039 (ECONOMICS LAB [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 13 - page 15 *; | [X]EP0086495 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 19; claim - *; | [X]WO8803133 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * examples 12-15 *; | [X] - W. UMBACH, "Continuous alkoxylation process", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (197108), vol. 48, no. 8, pages 394 - 397, XP002105841 [X] 1-7 * page 396 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02637359 | International search | [Y]US4267123 (CHEN CATHERINE S H, et al); | [Y]EP0064384 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) | [X] - AQUATIC TOXICOLOGY, 1993, Vol. 27, JOBLING et al., "Detergent Components in Sewage Effluent are Weakly Oestrogenic to Fish: An In Vitro Study Using Rainbow Trout (Oncorhynchus Mykiss) Hepatocytes", pages 361-372. |