EP0855451 - WIRING FILM, SPUTTER TARGET FOR FORMING THE WIRING FILM AND ELECTRONIC COMPONENT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIGAMI, Takashi 303-1-2-713, Katsura-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Koichi 14-1-D-103, Hiyoshi-Honcho 4-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | 03 /
NITTA, Akihisa 57-3-103, Higashi-Kibogaoka, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241 / JP | 04 /
MAKi, Toshihiro 3-8-15-P2-101, Konan, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 233 / JP | 05 /
YAGI, Noriaki 2121-D103, Totsuka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244 / JP | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96933629.6 | 14.10.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996JP02961 | Priority number, date | JP19950264472 | 12.10.1995 Original published format: JP 26447295 | [1998/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713885 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855451 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/14, C23C14/34, H01L21/3205, H01L23/48, H01L23/498, H01L27/01, H01L23/532 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/32051 (EP,US);
C23C14/14 (EP,KR,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C23C14/165 (EP,US);
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
H01L21/2855 (EP,US);
H01L21/3205 (KR);
H01L23/53214 (EP,US);
H01L23/53219 (EP,US);
H03H9/14538 (EP,US);
G02F1/136295 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/31] | C23C14/14, C23C14/34, H01L21/3205, H01L23/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/31] | Title | German: | DRAHTFILM, SPUTTERTARGET ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES DRAHTFILMS UND ELEKTRONISCHE TEILE, DIE DIESEN VERWENDEN | [1998/31] | English: | WIRING FILM, SPUTTER TARGET FOR FORMING THE WIRING FILM AND ELECTRONIC COMPONENT USING THE SAME | [1998/31] | French: | FILM DE CABLAGE, CIBLE DE PULVERISATION PAR BOMBARDEMENT IONIQUE DESTINEE A LA FORMATION DE CE FILM ET COMPOSANT ELECTRONIQUE COMPORTANT CE FILM | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1998 | Translation filed | 15.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP05003598.9 / EP1553205 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3911657 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4302498 (FAITH JR THOMAS J) [A] 1-17 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0745555 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [X]JPS62235454 (NIPPON MINING CO); | [X]JPS62240738 (NIPPON MINING CO); | [Y]JPH05171434 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05239635 (SHIMADZU CORP) |