EP0857256 - PNEUMO-HYDRAULIC CONVERTER FOR ENERGY STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cyphelly, Ivan Case Postale 18 2416 Les Brenets / CH | [1998/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland, et al Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Nithardt, Roland, et al Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/33] | Nithardt, Roland, et al CABINET NITHARDT ET ASSOCIES 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach BP 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1999/29] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/33] | Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Mag., Patentanwälte Babeluk - Krause, et al Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 96934298.9 | 01.11.1996 | [1998/33] | WO1996CH00386 | Priority number, date | CH19950003114 | 03.11.1995 Original published format: CH 311495 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717546 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857256 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857256 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/027, F15B3/00, F04B9/115, F28F5/00 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
F15B11/0725 (EP,US);
F15B3/00 (EP,US);
F28F5/00 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20515 (EP,US);
F15B2211/2053 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20569 (EP,US);
F15B2211/214 (EP,US);
F15B2211/216 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30525 (EP,US);
F15B2211/615 (EP,US);
F15B2211/625 (EP,US);
F15B2211/88 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1998/33] | Title | German: | PNEUMO-HYDRAULISCHER WANDLER FÜR ENERGIESPEICHERUNG | [1998/33] | English: | PNEUMO-HYDRAULIC CONVERTER FOR ENERGY STORAGE | [1998/33] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR PNEUMO-HYDRAULIQUE POUR ACCUMULER L'ENERGIE | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 21.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.03.1999 | NL | 31.03.1999 | [2002/27] |
Former [1999/36] | NL | 31.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5560707 ; | [Y]US2751144 (TROENDLE JEAN A) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]GB842608 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]FR1367103 (DORIS); | [A]WO8607118 (SILVA ETHAN) [A] 1 * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]US4823560 (ROWLEY C ALLEN [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800722), vol. 004, no. 102, Database accession no. (M - 022), & JP55060707 A 19800508 (KIMURA SHINDAI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * |