|
23.09.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.10.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
51 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
21.07.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2005 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.05.1998 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.1998 |
Demand for preliminary examination received in time (21-months time limit no longer applicable) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
92 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
82 |