|
20.03.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
58 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.01.2011 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
08.01.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.06.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.03.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
18.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2000 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.06.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
05.06.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |