EP0867091 - CALL SETUP GATEWAY FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Colin 19 Parklands Wotton-under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 7LT / GB | 02 /
BOUTHORS, Nicolas 16, Le Roupoir Les Bealires F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Squibbs, Robert Francis, et al Hewlett-Packard Limited IP Section, Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Squibbs, Robert Francis, et al Intellectual Property Section Building 2 Hewlett-Packard Limited Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96941763.3 | 11.12.1996 | [1998/40] | WO1996GB03049 | Priority number, date | GB19950025190 | 11.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9525190 | EP19950410148 | 22.12.1995 Original published format: EP 95410148 | GB19960003591 | 20.02.1996 Original published format: GB 9603591 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9722210 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867091 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867091 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
H04L61/10 (EP,US);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L61/30 (EP,US);
H04L61/4557 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M15/43 (EP,US);
H04M15/56 (EP,US);
H04M3/2281 (EP,US);
H04M3/4228 (EP,US);
H04M7/003 (EP,US);
H04M7/122 (EP,US);
H04M7/126 (EP,US);
H04M7/128 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04L2101/33 (EP,US);
H04L2101/65 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04M2201/60 (EP,US);
H04M2203/1041 (EP,US);
H04M2215/202 (EP,US);
H04M2215/22 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M3/42161 (EP,US);
H04M3/42229 (EP,US);
H04M3/42297 (EP,US);
H04M3/428 (EP,US);
H04M3/48 (EP,US);
H04M3/5191 (EP,US);
H04M3/523 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
H04M3/54 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M7/12 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13175 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13282 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13332 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13345 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13349 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13405 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13504 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13526 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13527 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13528 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/40] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSAUFBAUDURCHGANG FÜR EIN FERNMELDESYSTEM | [1998/40] | English: | CALL SETUP GATEWAY FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [1998/40] | French: | PASSERELLE D'ETABLISSEMENT DE COMMUNICATION POUR SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [1998/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04106083.1 / EP1519593 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | BE | 13.04.2005 | CH | 13.04.2005 | FI | 13.04.2005 | IT | 13.04.2005 | LI | 13.04.2005 | NL | 13.04.2005 | DK | 13.07.2005 | ES | 24.07.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 13.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0740445 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [PX] 1,2,18-20,23,26 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 48 *; | [X] - SWALE ET AL., "Distributed intelligence and data in public and private networks", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, IPSWICH GB, (199504), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 94 - 105, XP000500761 [X] 1,2,18-21,23,26 * page 100, column L, paragraph L - page 101, column L, line 16; figure 6 * * page 101, column R, paragraph 2 - page 103, column R, paragraph 2; figure 7 * | [X] - SEVCIK ET AL., "Customers in driver's seat: Private Intelligent Network control point", ISS '95 WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS, BERLIN DE, (19950423), vol. 2, pages 41 - 44, XP000495622 [X] 24-26 * page 42, column L, paragraph 5 - page 44, column L, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 * | [A] - TAO J ET AL, "Internet access via baseband and broadband ISDN gateways", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, PHOENIX US, (19940412), pages 485 - 490, XP000462600 [A] 1-5,14,15,18-20,23 * page 487, column R, paragraph L - page 488, column R, paragraph L * |