EP0865642 - FOREIGN EXCHANGE TRANSACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York New York 10043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states CITIBANK, N.A. 399 Park Avenue New York, New York 10043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSEN, Sholom, S. 10 West 86th Street New York, NY 10043 / US | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942047.0 | 21.11.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996US18787 | Priority number, date | US19950007420P | 21.11.1995 Original published format: US 7420 P | US19960754694 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: US 754694 | [1999/01] |
Former [1998/39] | US19950007420P | 21.11.1995 | |
US96 | 21.11.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9719427 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865642 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/08 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/023 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/06 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3676 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3678 (EP,US);
G06Q20/381 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | FREMDGELDWECHSEL-TRANSAKTIONSSYSTEM | [1998/39] | English: | FOREIGN EXCHANGE TRANSACTION SYSTEM | [1998/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSACTIONS SUR LE MARCHE DES CHANGES | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9530211 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [X] 23 * figure 5; claim 1 * [A] 1-22; | [A]EP0542298 (CITIBANK NA [US]) [A] 1-23 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0421808 (MANSVELT ANDRE PETER [ZA], et al) [A] 1-23 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5453601 (ROSEN SHOLOM S [US]) [AD] 1-23 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5258908 (HARTHEIMER RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * figure 1; claim 1 * |