EP0943125 - CONTROLLING TWO MONITORS WITH TRANSMISSION OF DISPLAY DATA USING A FIFO BUFFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPEA Software GmbH Moosstrasse 18b D-82319 Starnberg / DE | [1999/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRENNER, Alfred Leo-Putz-Weg 19 D-82131 Gauting / DE | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96942316.9 | 03.12.1996 | [1999/38] | WO1996EP05381 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825200 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0943125 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0943125 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/1446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1999/38] | Title | German: | ANSTEUERUNG VON ZWEI MONITOREN MIT ANZEIGEDATENÜBERTRAGUNG VIA FIFO-PUFFER | [1999/38] | English: | CONTROLLING TWO MONITORS WITH TRANSMISSION OF DISPLAY DATA USING A FIFO BUFFER | [1999/38] | French: | COMMANDE DE DEUX UNITES DE CONTROLE AVEC TRANSMISSION DES DONNEES D'AFFICHAGE VIA UN TAMPON FIFO | [1999/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 23.04.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH066724 ; | [Y]FR2528604 (TATSUMI DENSHI KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3-5,9,10 * page 2, line 8 - page 6, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO8802162 (COMVIEW AB [SE]) [A] 7,12 * siehe Zusammenfassung; page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5138305 (TOMIYASU YUICHI [JP]) [A] 12* siehe Zusammenfassung; column 4, line 28 - line 66; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE4404437 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 37 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]US5488385 (SINGHAL DAVE M [US], et al) [A] 2 * siehe Zusammenfassung; column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-3B * * column 7, line 26 - line 56 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940412), vol. 18, no. 205, Database accession no. (E - 1536), & JP06006724 A 00000000 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD.) [Y] 1,3-5,9,10 * abstract * [A] 7,8 |