|
30.11.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.01.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.03.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.11.2009 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.1999 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.1999 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1998 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.09.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.09.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
22.05.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |