Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0864145

EP0864145 - TACTILE FEEDBACK MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.01.2008  [2008/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Immersion Corporation
801 Fox Lane
San Jose, CA 95131 / US
[2002/48]
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
Virtual Technologies, Inc.
2175 Park Boulevard
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TREMBLAY, Marc, R.
110 Seale Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
02 / YIM, Mark, H.
Apartment 215,1091 Tanland Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
[1998/38]
Representative(s)Hamilton, Alistair , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]Hamilton, Alistair , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96944744.002.12.1996
[1998/38]
WO1996US19209
Priority number, dateUS1995056510230.11.1995         Original published format: US 565102
[1998/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9720305
Date:05.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0864145
Date:16.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997
[1998/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.06.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/00, G06F3/00
[1998/51]
Former International [1998/38]G09G5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/38]
TitleGerman:TAKTILE RÜCKKOPPLUNG FÜR MENSCH-/MASCHINENSCHNITTSTELLE[1998/38]
English:TACTILE FEEDBACK MAN-MACHINE INTERFACE DEVICE[1998/38]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE AVEC RETOUR D'INFORMATIONS TACTILE[1998/38]
Entry into regional phase19.06.1998National basic fee paid 
19.06.1998Search fee paid 
19.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
02.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
07.08.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/04]
18.09.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0626634  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9-11,19-24 * column 12, line 1 - column 14, line 45 * * column 17, lines 30-36 * * column 32, lines 11-32 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US5388992  (FRANKLIN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,11,21,23 * column 9, lines 11-24 * * figures 1,2,4A,8 *;
 [PXA]WO9609695  (THORNER CRAIG [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,9,21-24 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 13 * * figures 2,3 * [PA] 10,11,19
International search[Y]US5184319  (KRAMER JAMES F [US]);
 [Y]US4731603  (MCRAE ELIZABETH [GB], et al)