|
04.02.2014 |
Communication concerning corrections of the European patent specification |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Letter concerning publication issues |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2013 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.07.2011 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
17 |
|
02.03.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.10.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
148 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
148 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
27.09.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
04.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
41 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
123 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
88 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.12.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
63 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
195 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
35 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
42 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
158 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
62 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
138 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
90 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
84 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
69 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
79 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
46 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
46 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.09.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.02.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2000 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.1997 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
26.06.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |