EP0786745 - Enhanced security fingerprint sensor package and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Authentec Inc. 709 South Harbor City Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32901 / US | [2005/31] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCalley, Karl W. 125 Lansing Drive Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937 / US | 02 /
Setlak, Dale R. 3633 Sandy Crane Court Melbourne, FL 32934 / US | 03 /
Wilson, Steven D. 858 W. Armitage Avenue, Suite 265 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 04 /
van Vonno, Nicolaas W. 3775 Shady Run Road Melbourne, FL 32934 / US | 05 /
Hewitt, Charles L. 5201 Palomino Drive Melbourne, FL 32935 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97100540.0 | 15.01.1997 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | US19960592472 | 26.01.1996 Original published format: US 592472 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0786745 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0786745 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786745 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, G06K9/00 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
G06F21/86 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/1306 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (KR);
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06V40/12 (EP,US);
G06V40/67 (EP,KR,US);
G07C9/00563 (KR);
G07C9/26 (EP,US);
G07C9/37 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/3011, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/31] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Gehäuse für Sicherheitsfingerabdrucksensor und zugehörige Verfahren | [1997/31] | English: | Enhanced security fingerprint sensor package and related methods | [1997/31] | French: | Boîtier amélioré pour détecteur d'empreintes digitales de sécurité et procédés associés | [2004/23] |
Former [1997/31] | Boîtier améloiré pour détecteur d'empreintes digitales de sécurité et procédés associés | Examination procedure | 20.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | [2005/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4593384 (KLEIJNE THEODOOR A [NL]) [A] 1,8,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0379333 (GRAVES MARCEL ALBERT [US]) [A] 1,8,10,11 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 12; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4993068 (PIOSENKA GERALD V [US], et al) [A] 1,8,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5309387 (MORI RYOICHI [JP]) [A] 1,8,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9425938 (PERSONAL BIOMETRIC ENCODERS [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,10,11* page 7, paragraph 3; figure 4 * | by applicant | US3859633 | US3893080 | US4140272 | US4151512 | US4185270 | US4210899 | US4353056 | US4525859 | US4947443 | US4993068 | US5040224 | US5325442 | US5337357 | US5436972 |