EP0788249 - A node in an optical signal transmission network, and method of retaining the communication on the occurrence of a failure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Photonics Italy SrL Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milan / IT | [2003/50] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states PIRELLI CAVI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meli, Fausto Stradone Farnese, 100 Piacenza / IT | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Checcacci, Giorgio Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Checcacci, Giorgio Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/32] | Checcacci, Giorgio PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2 I-20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97101418.8 | 30.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI00199 | 05.02.1996 Original published format: IT MI960199 | [1997/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0788249 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788249 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/213 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
H04B10/27 (EP,US);
H04B10/275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/32] | Title | German: | Knoten eines optischen Übertragungsnetzes und Verfahren zur Übertragungsaufrechterhaltung nach einer Netzstörung | [1997/32] | English: | A node in an optical signal transmission network, and method of retaining the communication on the occurrence of a failure | [1997/32] | French: | Noeud pour réseau de transmission optique et procédé pour maintenir la communication en cas de défaillance | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 20.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.06.2003 | ES | 22.12.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/13] | ES | 22.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5442623 (WU TSONG-HO [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 7, line 13 - line 25 * * column 7, line 41 - line 45 * * column 9, line 18 - line 31 * * column 10, line 27 - line 36 * * column 15, line 47 - line 51 ** figures 8-14 *; | [A] - GAY ET AL, "Theoretical simulation and experimental investigation on a WDM survivable unidirectional open ring network using tunable channel selecting receivers", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199508), vol. 13, no. 8, pages 1636 - 1646, XP000537119 [A] 1-6 * page 1637, column L, line 21 - column R, line 2 * * page 1637, column R, line 14 - line 15 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.405305 | [A] - ELREFAIE, "Multiwavelength survivable ring network architectures", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, GENEVA, CH, (19930523), pages 1245 - 1251, XP000371271 [A] 1-6 * page 1246, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1246, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 1247, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 1248, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 3,5,10-12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397474 | [A] - GUIZANI ET AL, "Optical design of a fault tolerant self-routing switch for massively parallel processing networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MASSIVELY PARALLEL PROCESSING USING OPTICAL INTERCONNECTIONS, SAN ANTONIO, US, (1995), pages 246 - 253, XP002021846 [A] 1-6 * page 246, column R, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MPPOI.1995.528650 |