EP0822313 - Electrical switching arrangement for controlling several drives of windable and unwindable screens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernst Selve GmbH & Co. KG Werdohler Landstrasse 286 D-58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [1998/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiper, Jost Lohweg 34 57076 Siegen / DE | 02 /
Achenbach, Jens Am Gehäge 7 58515 Lüdenscheid / DE | 03 /
Hoffmann, Helmut Fasanenweg 3 57489 Drolshagen / DE | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad Köchling, Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97104862.4 | 21.03.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | DE1996130493 | 29.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19630493 | [1998/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822313 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822313 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/04, E06B9/68 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
E06B9/68 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/06] | E06B9/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/06] | Title | German: | Elektrische Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung mehrerer Antriebe für auf- und abwickelbare Behänge | [1998/06] | English: | Electrical switching arrangement for controlling several drives of windable and unwindable screens | [1998/06] | French: | Dispositif de commande électrique pour le contrôle de plusieurs moteurs d'entraînement d'écrans enroulables et déroulables | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH611969 (LYSS SELECTRON AG) [A] 1 * page 3, column 2, line 28 - page 4, column 2, line 12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0577201 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 36 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5062032 (JACQUEL DOMINIQUE) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 56 - line 16 * * claim 1 * |