EP0808948 - Wire rope net for protection against falling rocks, felling or avalanches and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oichtner, Franz Maria-Bühel-Strasse 7 5110 Oberndorf / AT | [2001/35] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states Kaiser, Hermann Gibriststrasse 719 5317 Hettenschwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, Hermann Gibriststrasse 719 5317 Hettenschwil / CH | [2001/35] |
Former [1997/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kägi, Otto, et al c/o Com Pat AG Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt, et al c/o Com Pat AG Gubelstrasse 17 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2000/15] | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner, Patentanwälte, Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1997/48] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 97107691.4 | 10.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | CH19960001318 | 24.05.1996 Original published format: CH 131896 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808948 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808948 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808948 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01F7/04 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
E01F7/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | Drahtseilnetz für Steinschlag-, Holzschlag- und Lawinenverbauungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [1997/48] | English: | Wire rope net for protection against falling rocks, felling or avalanches and method for making same | [1997/48] | French: | Filet métallique de protection contre les chutes de pierres, abattage de bois ou avalanches et méthode de fabrication | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 03.02.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH376459 (DINKEL EDWIN [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - line 30; figure . *; | [A]WO9322751 (COVER PROTECTION LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US5413148 (MINTZ MARCUS [US], et al) | Examination | GB435202 |