|
16.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Text: Decision / Communication |
Appeal |
28 |
|
04.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.09.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.08.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.06.2010 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Request for accelerated grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Preparation of grant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1998 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |