EP0821125 - Adjustable hinge arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 I-22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111331.1 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | DE1996212684U | 22.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29612684 U | [1998/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0821125 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
E05D7/0407 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, IT [1998/41] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 04.07.1997 | Title | German: | Verstellbarer Scharnierarm | [1998/05] | English: | Adjustable hinge arm | [1998/05] | French: | Bras de charnière réglable | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 19.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1506252 (BLUM GMBH [AT]) [A] 5 * page 2, line 12 - line 19 ** page 2, line 49 - line 61; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0168731 (SALICE ARTURO SPA) [Y] 1,4,9 * page 14, paragraph 5 - page 16, paragraph 2; figures 12-15 *; | [Y]EP0256376 (SALICE ARTURO SPA) [Y] 1,4,9 * page 8, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 3; figures 1,6,7 * |