EP0821243 - Test method of the correct connection of an impedance to a bridge output stage and related apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/05] | Test method of an impedance linked to a bridge output stage and appartatus related | ||
[2004/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markert, Siegfried Andreastrasse 8 31180 Giesen / DE | 02 /
Loehr, Achim Beaulieustrasse 13 31139 Hildesheim / DE | [1998/05] | Application number, filing date | 97111819.5 | 11.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | DE1996129781 | 24.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19629781 | [1998/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821243 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0821243 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821243 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G01R17/10 (EP,US);
G01R31/50 (EP,US);
H03F1/52 (EP);
G01R31/2825 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/19] | G01R31/02, G01R31/01 | ||
Former IPC [1998/05] | G01R31/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/06] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Prüfung des korrekten Anschlusses einer Impedanz an eine Brückenendstufe und Anordnung dazu | [2004/14] | English: | Test method of the correct connection of an impedance to a bridge output stage and related apparatus | [2004/14] | French: | Procédé de test de la bonne connection d'une impédance à un étage de sortie en pont et dispositif associé | [2004/14] |
Former [1998/05] | Verfahren zur Prüfung einer an eine Brückenendstufe angeschlossenen Impedanz und Anordnung dazu | ||
Former [1998/05] | Test method of an impedance linked to a bridge output stage and appartatus related | ||
Former [1998/05] | Procédé de test d'une impédance reliée à un étage de sortie en pont et dispositif associé | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29514157U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 3, line 5 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0365697 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]WO8800770 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph L; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE3842169 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * |