EP0830914 - Method of and apparatus for controlling welding conditions of a resistance welder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/13] | Method of controlling welding conditions of a resistance welder | ||
[2001/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuji, Koji 1-2-19-606, Nishisuminoe, Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 559 / JP | 02 /
Goto, Yasuhiro 2-12-1, Tsudumigataki Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-01 / JP | 03 /
Ryudo, Makoto 5-15-A-308, Ni-ina Mino-shi, Osaka 562 / JP | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116380.3 | 19.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | JP19960251092 | 24.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25109296 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830914 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0830914 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/25 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
B23K11/257 (EP,US);
B23K11/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kontrollieren der Schweissparameter einer Wiederstandschweissmaschine | [2001/06] | English: | Method of and apparatus for controlling welding conditions of a resistance welder | [2001/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil de contrôle des paramètres de soudage d'une machine à souder par résistance | [2001/06] |
Former [1998/13] | Verfahren zum Kontrollieren der Schweissparameter einer Wiederstandschweissmaschine | ||
Former [1998/13] | Method of controlling welding conditions of a resistance welder | ||
Former [1998/13] | Méthode de contrôle des paramètres de soudage d'une machine à souder par résistance | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH07185835 ; | [AD]JPS5961580 ; | [AD]JPH01216246 ; | [A]GB2073446 (WELTRONIC CO) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0129963 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0350013 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0581315 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5440092 (KAWAI SHINGO [JP]) [A] 1,10,11 * column A; figures 1-3; claims 1,4 *; | [XP]EP0780186 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,10,11 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 95, no. 10, & JP07185835 A 19950725 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,10,11 * abstract * [A] 2-9 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840802), vol. 8, no. 166, Database accession no. (M - 314), & JP59061580 A 19840407 (TOYOTA SHIYATAI KK) [AD] 1,10,11 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891124), vol. 13, no. 527, Database accession no. (P - 965), & JP01216246 A 19890830 (TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO KK ET AL.) [AD] 1,10,11 * abstract * |