|
08.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.02.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.09.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2009 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.09.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.1997 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1997 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.1997 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |