EP0845480 - Polyvinyl alcohol hydrogel and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621 Sakazu Kurashiki-City / JP | [1998/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Hiroaki 2-6-5, Fukushima Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 02 /
Abe, Masanobu 4-20-16-206, Fukushima Okayama-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Oka, Keiko 501-3, Fukushima Kurashiki-shi, Okayama-ken / JP | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/23] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120846.7 | 27.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | JP19960317522 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31752296 | JP19960317523 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31752396 | JP19970011057 | 24.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1105797 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845480 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845480 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/28, C08F116/06, C08J3/075, C02F1/28 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
C02F3/108 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/28 (EP,US);
C08J3/075 (EP,US);
C08J2329/04 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/28, C08F16/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/08] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polyvinylalkoholhydrogel und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/23] | English: | Polyvinyl alcohol hydrogel and process for producing the same | [1998/23] | French: | Hydrogel d'alcool polyvinylique et procédé pour le préparer | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 06.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.05.2003 | IT | 02.05.2003 | NL | 02.05.2003 | GB | 27.11.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 02.05.2003 | |
NL | 02.05.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | NL | 02.05.2003 | |
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 02.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JPH09124731 ; | [A]JPH07247365 | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 29, Database accession no. 97-316594, XP002057890 & JPH09124731 A 19970513 (KURARAY CO LTD) [PX] 1,3,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 47, Database accession no. 95-363636, XP002057891 & JPH07247365 A 19950926 (KURARAY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | JPH09124731 |