EP0919362 - Oil driven die press with vertical axial thrust, equipped with several die pairs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vam Aerotecnica di Borghi Mauro Via Collamarini 3 40138 Bologna / IT | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mauro, Borghi Via Barelli, 4 40138 Bologna / IT | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Rinaldi, Carlo c.o. Studio Brevetti Nazionali ed Esteri dell'Ing. Carlo Rinaldi & C. s.d.f. Piazza di Porta Castiglione, 16 40136 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Rinaldi, Carlo c.o. Studio Brevetti Nazionali ed Esteri dell'Ing. Carlo Rinaldi & C. s.d.f. Piazza di Porta Castiglione, 16 40136 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 97120989.5 | 28.11.1997 | [1999/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0919362 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B30B7/02, B30B1/32 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
B30B1/32 (EP);
B30B15/04 (EP);
B30B7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2000/07] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Olydinamische Gesenkpresse mit vertikaler Achsialschub, ausgestattet mit mehreren Gesenkpaaren | [1999/22] | English: | Oil driven die press with vertical axial thrust, equipped with several die pairs | [1999/22] | French: | Presse à matrices mûe par huile, ayant une poussée axiale verticale, équipée de plusieurs paires de matrices | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 03.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 05.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 25.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4461164 (LAVIANO SAMUEL [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 24 - line 59; figure - * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]DE19611611 (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *; | [X]US2048352 (HEINRICH REITZ) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 2, column L, line 13 - line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3073238 (ANTONIO VITALI) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 17 - line 31; figures 5,6 * |