|
09.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.10.2008 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2008 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
06.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.08.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.10.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
11.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2000 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.03.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.08.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1998 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
06.12.1997 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |