EP0789481 - Radiation image read out system and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2004/15] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Exelmans, Walter c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800 Septestraat 27, B - 2640 Mortsel / BE | [1997/33] | Application number, filing date | 97200268.7 | 31.01.1997 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | EP19960200273 | 08.02.1996 Original published format: EP 96200273 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0789481 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0789481 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789481 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, G01T1/29 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
G03B42/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum auslesen von Strahlungsbildern | [1997/33] | English: | Radiation image read out system and apparatus | [1997/33] | French: | Système et appareil pour la lecture d'images de radiation | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5028785 (KIMURA TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 48 *; | [A]JPH07191421 ; | [PA]US5530261 (YASUDA HIROAKI [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 34 * * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0345832 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-7 * column 6, line 25 - line 47 * * column 13, line 12 - line 55; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, & JP07191421 A 19950728 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0345832 | EP0567175 |