EP0805059 - Hybrid power transmission with power take-off apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Michael Roland 4620 Buckingham Court Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/08] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/45] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97200889.0 | 24.03.1997 | [1997/45] | Priority number, date | US19960638664 | 29.04.1996 Original published format: US 638664 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0805059 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0805059 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805059 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04, B60K25/06 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K17/28 (EP,US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/30 (EP,US);
F16H3/728 (EP,US);
F16H37/0806 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0873 (EP,US);
F16H37/0813 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/91 (EP);
Y10S903/914 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/45] | Title | German: | Hybridantrieb mit Zusatzantrieben | [1997/45] | English: | Hybrid power transmission with power take-off apparatus | [1997/45] | French: | Transmission hybride avec prises de force | [1997/45] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3009503 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3140492 (LOESCH LUDWIG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0552140 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0645271 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0649769 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |