EP0808978 - Vehicle closure latch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/48] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paulik, Jiri 1878 Graefield Birmingham, Michigan 48009 / US | 02 /
Carter, Eluid David 1025 Field Detroit, Michigan 48214 / US | 03 /
Paulik, Rita Margarete 1878 Graefield Birmingham, Michigan 48009 / US | 04 /
Johnson, Joseph Michael 13337 Victoria Huntington Woods, Michigan 48070 / US | 05 /
Ciavaglia, Michael Antonio 1121 North York Dearborn, Michigan 48128 / US | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97201171.2 | 21.04.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | US19960652017 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: US 652017 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808978 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808978 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/32, E05B17/00 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
E05B77/38 (EP,US);
E05B77/40 (EP,US);
E05C3/26 (KR);
E05B15/0046 (EP,US);
E05B2015/165 (EP,US);
E05B85/243 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1997/48] | E05B65/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/48] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss | [1997/48] | English: | Vehicle closure latch | [1997/48] | French: | Fermeture pour porte de véhicule automobile | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5348357 (KONCHAN JEFFREY L [US], et al) [YD] 1-5 * figure 7; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE2006180 (W MOERES) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH04161579 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920922), vol. 16, no. 456, & JP04161579 A 19920604 (MITSUI MINING) [A] 1 * abstract * |