EP0835049 - Apparatus and methods of providing corrosion resistant conductive path across non conductive joints or gaps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuras, John Charles 129 - 75th Avenue S.W. Everett, Washington 98203 / US | 02 /
McClam-Brown, Nadine 1427 Thornberry Road Wyncote, Pennsylvania 19095 / US | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/15] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 97202940.9 | 25.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | US19960726041 | 07.10.1996 Original published format: US 726041 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0835049 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0835049 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
B32B3/08 (US);
B32B15/14 (US);
B64D45/02 (EP,US);
B32B2305/38 (US);
B32B2307/202 (US);
H01R2201/02 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2804 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/14] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Beschaffung einer leitenden korrosionsbeständigen Strecke durch nichtleitenden Fügen und zwischenräume | [1998/15] | English: | Apparatus and methods of providing corrosion resistant conductive path across non conductive joints or gaps | [1998/15] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour réaliser un chemin conducteur résistant à la corrosion à travers des joints ou des interstices non conducteurs | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8605062 (GUSTAFSON AOKE) [Y] 1-8 * figure 3; example 2 *; | [X]US4977296 (HEMMING LELAND H [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 34 - line 57; figures 1,3 *; | [DA]US5239125 (SAVAGE HOWARD S [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * column 3, line 24 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [DY]US5312508 (CHISHOLM JOHN [US]) [DY] 1-8 * column 2, line 4 - line 20; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9507600 (INT PAPER CO [US]) [A] 1-8* page 12, line 11 - line 19; figure 1 * |