EP0798314 - Devolatilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVA CHEMICALS (INTERNATIONAL) S.A. Route de la Glane 107, P.O. Box 76 1752 Villars-sur-Glane 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states Nova Chemicals (International) S.A. Route de la Glane 107, P.O. Box 76 1752 Villars-sur-Glane 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krupinski, Steven 68 North Main Street West Boylston, MA 01583 / US | 02 /
McQueen, James T. 130 Bryant Road Jaffrey, New Hampshire 03452 / US | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97301061.4 | 19.02.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | US19960623228 | 28.03.1996 Original published format: US 623228 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798314 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798314 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/28 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
C08F6/28 (EP,US);
C08F6/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/40] | Title | German: | Entgasung | [1997/40] | English: | Devolatilization | [1997/40] | French: | Dégazage | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0233661 (STAMICARBON [NL]) [A] * abstract *; | [X]EP0371230 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4109527 (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 47 - page 3, line 39 *; | [DX]US5102591 (HASSON ALEXANDROS [US], et al) [DX] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - line 68 * * column 6, line 41 - line 49 *; | [Y]US5350813 (SKILBECK JOHN P [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 45 *; | [A]US5442041 (MALLIKARJUN RAMESH [US], et al) [A] * abstract * |