Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0819729
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.02.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] |
09.02.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
09.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.06.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
21.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.08.1998 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
31.07.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] |
05.12.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |