Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09183865 | Global Dossier | 15.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0769522 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2003 | B1 | EP0769522 | 23.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1100822C | 05.02.2003 | C | CN1155558 | 30.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69626081T | 27.11.2003 | T2 | DE69626081D1 | 13.03.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2191742T | 16.09.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2741084 | 16.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2741085 | 24.04.1998 | B1 | FR2741085 | 16.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG47182 | 20.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9512298 | 19.10.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10102043 | Global Dossier | 21.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0819729 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2001 | B1 | EP0819729 | 21.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1102942C | 12.03.2003 | C | CN1172826 | 11.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69704402T | 04.10.2001 | T2 | DE69704402D1 | 03.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2155241T | 01.05.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG55346 | 21.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9608820 | 15.07.1996 |