EP0822712 - Method and apparatus for the inputting of control information for operating an audiovisual apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugano, Tetsuo, Mitsubishi Elec. Eng. Co., Ltd 6-2, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Sataoaki, Mitsubishi Elec. Eng. Co., Ltd 6-2, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97305607.0 | 25.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | JP19960198661 | 29.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19866196 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822712 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822712 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822712 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
H04N21/47214 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N5/765 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/26] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Eingabe von Steuerinformation für ein audio-visuelles Gerät | [1998/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for the inputting of control information for operating an audiovisual apparatus | [1998/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'entrée d'information pour la commande du fonctionnement d'un dispositif audiovisuel | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4641205 (BEYERS JR BILLY W [US]) [A] 1,3,11,12 * column 1, line 26 - line 57 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 22 *; | [A]EP0115145 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5373330 (LEVINE MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 4 * the whole document * |