EP0910986 - Imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Barry George William, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department - PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Lloyd, Barry George William, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97308526.9 | 24.10.1997 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910986 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117, A61B3/12 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/1176 (EP,US);
G06V40/16 (EP,US);
G06V40/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/02] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsapparat | [1999/17] | English: | Imaging apparatus | [1999/17] | French: | Appareil d'imagerie | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/21] | 11.05.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2000/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2119941 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK) [X] 1-3,6-8 * page 2, line 36 - line 56 * * page 2, line 121 - page 3, line 25 * * page 4, line 14 - line 32 * [A] 4; | [YA]US4821118 (LAFRENIERE ROGER F [US]) [Y] 1,11,12 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 35 * * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 43 * * column 13, line 3 - column 14, line 56 * [A] 2,6,8,9; | [YA]US5572596 (WILDES RICHARD P [US], et al) [Y] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 19 - line 62 * * column 4, line 1 - line 31 * * column 7, line 15 - line 41 * [A] 10; | [A]GB2201801 (JANOME SEWING MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1,2,6,8,9 * page 2, line 15 - line 36 * * page 5, line 16 - line 35 *; | [A]EP0126549 (EYE D DEV II LTD [US]) [A] 1,10-12 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 24 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 23 *; | [A]EP0534477 (HEBEISEN SUSAN [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,8 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 17 * |