EP0791741 - Thermal insulation for solid rocket motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild 92150 Suresnes / FR | ||
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION (S.E.P.) S.A. 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild 92150 Suresnes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourdoncle, Jacques 14, Clos des Tourterelles 33160 ST Aubin De Medoc / FR | 02 /
Le Magourou, Loic 6, rue Etienne Falconet 33160 ST Medard en Jalles / FR | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97400337.8 | 14.02.1997 | [1997/35] | Priority number, date | FR19960002051 | 20.02.1996 Original published format: FR 9602051 | [1997/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791741 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791741 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/34 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
F02K9/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/35] | Title | German: | Wärmeisolatorschicht für Feststoffraketenmotor | [1997/35] | English: | Thermal insulation for solid rocket motor | [1997/35] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'une protection thermique interne pour propulseur | [1997/35] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2144071 (EUROP PROPULSION) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * * page 2, line 23 - line 25 *; | [Y]JPS6260617 ; | [Y]US4108940 (RATTE JACQUES, et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 11 - line 18 * * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 7 *; | [A]EP0659860 (POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]) [A] 3,4 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 *; | [A]GB2178745 (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE) [A] 1 * page 2, line 12 - line 16 *; | [A]US4501771 (LONG DELMAR D [US]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 8 - line 20 * * column 8, line 24 - line 30 * * column 7, line 21 - line 24 *; | [A]JPS555944 ; | [A]US4942214 (SAKHPARA DILIP J [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 15 * * column 1, line 53 - line 60 * * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870814), vol. 011, no. 250, Database accession no. (M - 616), & JP62060617 A 19870317 (SHIN ETSU POLYMER CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800315), vol. 004, no. 030, Database accession no. (C - 002), & JP55005944 A 19800117 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |