EP0835906 - Dispersions of optical brightening agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohringer, Peter Sechsjuchartenstrasse 1 4124 Schönenbuch / CH | 02 /
Traber, Rainer Hans Im Stockacker 26 4153 Reinach / CH | 03 /
Ruf, Peter Heleneviksbacken 7B 431 36 Mölndal / SE | 04 /
Engelhardt, Thomas In den Burgreben 5A 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [1998/16] | Application number, filing date | 97810722.5 | 01.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | CH19960002473 | 10.10.1996 Original published format: CH 247396 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0835906 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0835906 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835906 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/3492, D21H21/30, C08K5/00 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C08K5/0041 (EP,US);
C09B57/00 (KR);
D21H21/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | C08K5/3492, D21H21/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/08] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dispersionen von optischen Aufhellern | [1998/16] | English: | Dispersions of optical brightening agents | [1998/16] | French: | Dispersions d'azurants optiques | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1998 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 29.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.02.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 07.03.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 16.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4216111 (THOMPSON JOHN D [GB]) [Y] 1-24 * column 2, line 39 - line 60 * * column 3, line 19 - line 51 *; | [A]GB2107606 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [A] 1-10,19-24 * page 7, line 19 - line 21 ** page 8, line 49 - line 56; example 3; claim - *; | [Y]US5429767 (ZELGER JOSEF [CH]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document * |