EP0834908 - Method and arrangement for drying substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEZ AG Draubodenweg 29 9500 Villach / AT | [2002/34] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states SEZ Semiconductor-Equipment Zubehör für die Halbleiterfertigung AG Draubodenweg 29 9500 Villach / AT | ||
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states SEZ Semiconductor-Equipment Zubehör für die Halbleiterfertigung AG Draubodenweg 29 9500 Villach / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kruwinus, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Herrmann-Findenegg-Weg 5 9500 Villach (AT) / AT | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97890193.2 | 23.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | AT19960001734 | 01.10.1996 Original published format: AT 173496 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834908 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, B08B7/00 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
H01L21/67034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/52] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Substraten | [1998/15] | English: | Method and arrangement for drying substrates | [1998/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour sécher des substrats | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/42] | 26.05.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0553967 (SUBMICRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,6,11 * claims 1,4-6,9 *; | [A]US4736758 (KUSUHARA MASAKI [JP]) [A] 1,5,9-11 * column 12, line 10 - line 39; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4028135 (VIG JOHN R, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0297506 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |